Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4188 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17594 Week
» 70610 Month
» 190137 Year
» 3216990 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8637 |
m/e |
04/1944 |
War Dept. |
78637 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90634 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5038 |
To Service |
During 04/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8637 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5038 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78637 |
|
|
28/07/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90634 |
|
|
09/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
10/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90634 |
|
|
04/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston |
|
|