Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1470 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19273 Week
» 72289 Month
» 191816 Year
» 3218669 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8642 |
m/e |
04/1944 |
War Dept. |
78642 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3135 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63135 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90456 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5043 |
To Service |
During 04/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 27/02/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 10 mths , 27 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
NWE |
New England |
on |
29/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
IMM |
Immingham |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/02/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8642 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5043 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78642 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3135 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63135 but not taken up |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90456 |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
27/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90456 |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|