Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 646 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14052 Week
» 67068 Month
» 186595 Year
» 3213448 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8650 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
War Dept. |
78650 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90638 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5051 |
To Service |
During 05/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/12/1962 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8650 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5051 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78650 |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90638 |
|
|
25/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
22/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90638 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|