Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 4302 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17708 Week
» 70724 Month
» 190251 Year
» 3217104 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8652 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
War Dept. |
78652 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90639 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5053 |
To Service |
During 05/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 05/01/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1944 |
25C |
|
Goole |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
25A |
|
Wakefield |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/01/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
LOAN |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
EXLOAN |
25A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
20/03/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/01/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8652 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5053 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78652 |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90639 |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
05/01/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90639 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |
|
|