Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 204 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18007 Week
» 71023 Month
» 190550 Year
» 3217403 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8654 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
War Dept. |
78654 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3142 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63142 |
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
British Railways |
90463 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5055 |
To Service |
During 05/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/11/1963 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1944 |
67C |
|
Ayr |
4w/e |
25/10/1958 |
67D |
|
Ardrossan |
4w/e |
11/02/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/11/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
4w/e |
11/02/1961 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. |
SLS/194704 |
30/08/1961 |
Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: D2708/70/4, 44783, 45213, 45361, 61324/46/96, 65919, 80030, 90017, 90386, 90463, 90614. Valve Shop: 73077. Stripping Shop: 65923. Weigh House: 64847. Paint Shop: 73099. Works Yard: D2434, D2726, D3393, 44485, 61178, 64932, 72009, 73005, 80045, 90753. Scrap Yard: 64710 intact, 64700 being out-up. Works Shunters: D2760, D3418. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8654 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5055 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78654 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3142 |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63142 |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90463 |
|
|
25/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
14/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90463 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by P.W. McLellan: Coatbridge |
|
|