Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 305 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18108 Week
» 71124 Month
» 190651 Year
» 3217504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8655 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
War Dept. |
78655 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3143 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63143 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90464 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5056 |
To Service |
During 05/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/03/1964 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. |
SLS/194704 |
26/01/1952 |
Scottish Miscellany |
Five of the 'Clan' Class are now at Polmadie and work through to Manchester, going out from Glasgow (Central) at 1.45 p.m. and 4.5 p.m., returning on 9.30 a.m. and 2.0 p.m. from Manchester. The spare engine is utilised on relieving duties. Of the new B.R. 2-6-4T working from Corkerhill, one is going through to Girvan on passenger turns but reports of regular late arrivals are made by local people. The two preserved engines at St. Rollox (C.R. 4-2-2 No. 123 and H.R. 4-6-0 No. 103) were recently re-varnished. After threatening withdrawal of passenger service, B.R. have now stated that the Lockerbie-Dumfries service is to be continued. It is rumoured locally that the Kinross Jct.-Alloa passenger service is to be discontinued shortly. B.R. 4-6-2, No. 72005 (68A) appeared in mid-March at Stranraer on the 8.55 a.m. train from Glasgow. It is stated locally that the class may appear regularly during the summer when traffic is heavier. A 2-6-4T of the 80000 series has also been seen working (test?) trains on the Girvan and Newton Stewart roads. No. 55262 ex C.R. 0-4-4T has been noted after overhaul with standard cast chimney in place of the shorter one for this series. W.D. No. 90464 noted at Eastfield on 15th March with red L.M.S. corridor tender, presumably for dynamometer tests in the area. |
SLS/195204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8655 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5056 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78655 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3143 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63143 but not taken up |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90464 |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
12/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
21/03/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90464 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|