|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/07/1961 | Cowlairs Works (Ex-Works ) | Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 8658 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5059 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 78658 | ||
03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90640 | ||
13/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
06/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) | ||
02/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
11/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) | ||
29/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
30/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
09/08/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90640 | ||
01/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |