Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 763 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14169 Week
» 67185 Month
» 186712 Year
» 3213565 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8661 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
War Dept. |
78661 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3145 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63145 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
British Railways |
90466 |
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5062 |
To Service |
During 05/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 26/12/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/09/1951 |
Purchased by L.N.E.R. |
'W.D.' locomotives purchases by the L.N.E.R. had, until recently, not been allocated to ex. G.W.R. and L.M.S. On 16th September four of these 200 engines were transferred on loan to the Western Region from Immingham and a week later No. 90466 was similarly transferred from Colwick: so that there is perhaps no particular, significance in the fact that hitherto these particular engines- have kept to their 'L.N.E.' metals. |
SLS/195111 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8661 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5062 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78661 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3145 |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63145 |
|
|
30/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90466 |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
29/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (84K) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leamington (84D) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
30/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
26/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90466 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|