Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4134 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17540 Week
» 70556 Month
» 190083 Year
» 3216936 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8662 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
War Dept. |
78662 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3146 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63146 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90467 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5063 |
To Service |
During 05/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 18/11/1963 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
08/07/1962 |
York South MPD |
Stored in the old south shed are 60887/95/939/82 all ex works, 61039, 61240 and 90467/571/8/663, also four BRCW d.m.us. damaged in a collision in March, viz. uE50543/76/9201/22, all noted 8th July. |
SLS/196208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8662 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5063 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78662 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3146 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63146 but not taken up |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90467 |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
18/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90467 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|