Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 420 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18223 Week
» 71239 Month
» 190766 Year
» 3217619 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8663 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
War Dept. |
78663 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3147 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63147 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90468 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5064 |
To Service |
During 06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/04/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8663 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5064 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78663 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3147 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63147 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90468 |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
14/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
27/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90468 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|