|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 8665 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5066 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 78665 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3149 | ||
08/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63149 | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90470 | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
21/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
07/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E) | ||
11/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
21/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90470 | ||
03/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |