|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/08/1963 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall Steam Bay) | New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 8667 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5068 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 78667 | ||
03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3150 | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63150 but not taken up | ||
10/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90471 | ||
20/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
24/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
12/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
19/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
09/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
13/11/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
05/03/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/04/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90471 | ||
09/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |