Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 625 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3311 Week
» 4201 Month
» 312182 Year
» 1196563 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8670 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 78670 m/e 01/1945
LNER (1946) 3152 m/e 03/1947
BR (1st BR) 63152 m/e 30/04/1948
BR 90473 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5071
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 18 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
38A Colwick 4w/e 24/10/1953
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England 18/12/1945
ALLOC DON Doncaster 13/01/1947
ALLOC MAR March 13/06/1947
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common 22/03/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8670
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5071
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78670    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90473    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90473    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    

prev prev