Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 432 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18235 Week
» 71251 Month
» 190778 Year
» 3217631 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8673 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
War Dept. |
78673 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3153 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63153 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90474 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5074 |
To Service |
During 06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 18/07/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8673 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5074 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78673 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3153 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63153 but not taken up |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90474 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
18/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90474 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |
|
|