Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 610 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19521 Week
» 84475 Month
» 287139 Year
» 3313992 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8675 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
War Dept. |
78675 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90644 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5076 |
To Service |
During 06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 24/06/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1944 |
56B |
|
Ardsley |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
55E |
|
Normanton |
4w/e |
06/11/1965 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/06/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
3w/e |
02/07/1960 |
ALLOC |
55E |
Normanton |
4w/e |
06/11/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/06/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8675 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5076 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78675 |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90644 |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90644 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |
|
|