Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4116 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17522 Week
» 70538 Month
» 190065 Year
» 3216918 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8679 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
War Dept. |
78679 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3157 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63157 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90478 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5080 |
To Service |
During 06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 09/09/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/08/1967 |
West Hartlepool MPD |
The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8679 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5080 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78679 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3157 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63157 but not taken up |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90478 |
|
|
12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
21/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (53E) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90478 |
|
|