Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 400 Today
» 1154 Yesterday
» 4922 Week
» 25824 Month
» 25824 Year
» 1247389 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8683 m/e 07/1944
War Dept. 78683 m/e 01/1945
BR 90647 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5084
To Service During 07/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/03/1965
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 20 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
35A New England 5w/e 24/03/1951
36C Frodingham 4w/e 21/07/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 07/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ANN Annesley 04/09/1947
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 12/06/1948
ALLOC 35A New England m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 36C Frodingham w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 12/07/1953
WDN   w/e 07/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8683
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5084
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78683    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90647    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
08/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90647    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev