|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/04/1965 | Doncaster Works (Stored) | Erecting shop: D1522, D1776, D2039, D2554, D2958, D3159, D3327, D3650, D3689, D4073, D5051/580/607/48, D5809/49/50/61, D6716/48; Outside: D5557/95, D5623, D6733, D8233; Stripping shop: D5588, D5632/52/4/80 also D3444, D5615, D9009 an D4066; New Erecting shop: E3111-3120, D5532, D8228, D9001; Paint shop and area: E3102/8/9/10/21/2, D3701, D5557/95, D5623/84, D6729/33, D6973/4/5, D8233; Stored: 63906, 90042/70/119/647, 92192. | SLS/196505 |
02/05/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Shed stored) | Shed stored: 63741, 90059/70/120/647. | SLS/196506 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 8683 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5084 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 78683 | ||
12/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
09/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90647 | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
21/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
07/03/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90647 | ||
07/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |