Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2119 Week
» 9303 Month
» 317284 Year
» 1201665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8684 m/e 07/1944
War Dept. 78684 m/e 01/1945
BR 90648 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5085
To Service During 07/1944
Withdrawal Thu 30/08/1962
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 18 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
38E Woodford Halse 5w/e 24/03/1951
38A Colwick 4w/e 16/05/1953
40B Immingham 4w/e 13/09/1958
40E Colwick w/e 15/08/1959
40B Immingham w/e 13/08/1960
36C Frodingham w/e 15/10/1960
   Withdrawn 30/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NEV Neville Hill 15/10/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 12/07/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/09/1960
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   30/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8684
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5085
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78684    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90648    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
13/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
15/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90648    
09/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    

prev prev