Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 115 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2429 Week
» 13722 Month
» 278355 Year
» 1499920 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8685 m/e 07/1944
War Dept. 78685 m/e 01/1945
BR 90649 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2300
Works Number 5086
To Service During 07/1944
Withdrawal Sat 21/01/1967
Scrapping During 05/1967 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 22 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1944
55G Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 20/06/1959
   Withdrawn on 21/01/1967
55D Royston 4w/e 28/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction w/e 04/03/1950
ALLOC 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   on 21/01/1967
ALLOC 55D Royston 8w/e 25/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8685
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5086
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78685    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90649    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G)    
21/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90649    
28/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    

prev prev