Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2213 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15619 Week
» 68635 Month
» 188162 Year
» 3215015 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8686 |
m/e |
07/1944 |
War Dept. |
78686 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3159 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63159 |
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
British Railways |
90480 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5087 |
To Service |
During 07/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 01/08/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1944 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
18/04/1959 |
34B |
|
Hornsey |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
01/08/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
YK |
York (North) |
on |
24/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
on |
27/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
16/04/1960 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
08/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/08/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8686 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5087 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78686 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3159 |
|
|
03/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63159 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90480 |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
01/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90480 |
|
|
09/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath |
|
|