Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3718 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17124 Week
» 70140 Month
» 189667 Year
» 3216520 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8690 |
m/e |
07/1944 |
War Dept. |
78690 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3161 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63161 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90482 |
on |
10/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5091 |
To Service |
During 07/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 12/07/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8690 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5091 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78690 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3161 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63161 but not taken up |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) |
|
|
10/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90482 |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
06/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
12/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90482 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale |
|
|