08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8696 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5097 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78696 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3164 |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63164 |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) |
|
|
10/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90485 |
|
|
11/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
31/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
31/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
13/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85E) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
02/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
09/08/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90485 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |
|
|