Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 458 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 458 Week
» 22964 Month
» 326154 Year
» 1547719 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8696 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 78696 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3164 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63164 w/e 19/06/1948
British Railways 90485 on 10/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2300
Works Number 5097
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Sun 09/08/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 20 yrs , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1944
50F Malton 4w/e 17/02/1951
50A York (North) 5w/e 23/06/1951
91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 31/08/1951
84C Banbury 4w/e 31/01/1952
81C Southall 4w/e 01/11/1952
85B Gloucester Horton Road 8w/e 20/04/1957
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 18/05/1957
85A Worcester 4w/e 13/07/1957
87G Carmarthen 4w/e 22/03/1958
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 28/11/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 30/01/1960
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 27/02/1960
85E Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 23/04/1960
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 18/06/1960
84C Banbury 4w/e 04/11/1961
41F Mexborough on 02/12/1962
41D Canklow w/e 07/03/1964
   Withdrawn on 09/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN YK York (North) on 07/12/1945
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 50F Malton w/e 11/02/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) w/e 16/06/1951
LOAN 40B Immingham on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 22/09/1951
LOAN 84B Oxley m/e 31/10/1951
LOAN 84C Banbury 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 85E Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 23/04/1960
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region on 02/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   on 09/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704
19/04/1958 Carmarthen MPD W.D. 2-8-0's 90167/79/207/485/529 have been allocated to replace the remaining R.O.D's as they are withdrawn. SLS/195805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8696
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5097
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78696    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3164    
19/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63164    
10/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90485    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Malton (50F)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
13/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85E)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
09/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90485    

prev prev