Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1174 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18977 Week
» 71993 Month
» 191520 Year
» 3218373 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8700 |
m/e |
08/1944 |
War Dept. |
78700 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90653 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5101 |
To Service |
During 08/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 05/09/1962 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MEX |
Mexborough |
on |
18/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
on |
27/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
w/e |
11/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
on |
12/07/1953 |
ALLOC |
33A |
Plaistow |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
ALLOC |
33B |
Tilbury |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8700 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5101 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78700 |
|
|
18/11/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Mexborough (MEX) (On loan from War Department) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90653 |
|
|
27/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
14/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
05/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90653 |
|
|
03/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford |
|
|