Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 792 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2907 Week
» 25413 Month
» 328603 Year
» 1550168 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8700 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 78700 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90653 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2300
Works Number 5101
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Wed 05/09/1962
Scrapping During 03/1963 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)
Service Life 18 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1944
31B March 4w/e 21/10/1950
36B Mexborough 4w/e 17/02/1951
33A Plaistow 3w/e 14/05/1955
33B Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 05/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 18/11/1947
ALLOC 31B March on 27/09/1950
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 11/02/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough on 12/07/1953
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 05/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8700
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5101
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78700    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90653    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
14/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
05/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90653    

prev prev