Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2880 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16286 Week
» 69302 Month
» 188829 Year
» 3215682 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8703 |
m/e |
08/1944 |
War Dept. |
78703 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3169 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63169 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
British Railways |
90490 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5104 |
To Service |
During 08/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 18/02/1964 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8703 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5104 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78703 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3169 |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63169 |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90490 |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
11/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
18/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90490 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|