Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 213 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7673 Week
» 5186 Month
» 233070 Year
» 1454635 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8703 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 78703 m/e 01/1945
LNER (1946) 3169 m/e 02/1947
BR (1st BR) 63169 w/e 24/04/1948
BR 90490 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5104
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Tue 18/02/1964
Scrapping During 04/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 19 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1944
36C Frodingham 4w/e 21/07/1951
34E New England w/e 11/11/1961
40B Immingham w/e 29/09/1962
   Withdrawn 18/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England 24/12/1945
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC 36C Frodingham w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 09/12/1961
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   18/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8703
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5104
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78703    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3169    
24/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63169    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90490    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
11/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
18/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90490    

prev prev