Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1024 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18827 Week
» 71843 Month
» 191370 Year
» 3218223 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8707 |
m/e |
08/1944 |
War Dept. |
78707 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3171 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63171 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90492 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5108 |
To Service |
During 08/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 17/10/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/08/1967 |
West Hartlepool MPD |
The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8707 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5108 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78707 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3171 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63171 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90492 |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
17/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90492 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|