|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. | SLS/194704 |
31/12/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. | SLS/195002 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 8708 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5109 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 78708 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3172 | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63172 but not taken up | ||
05/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU) | ||
26/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
01/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90493 | ||
16/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
14/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
01/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) | ||
21/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) | ||
17/04/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
27/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90493 | ||
07/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |