Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8476 Week
» 5989 Month
» 233873 Year
» 1455438 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR (1st BR) 63172   Not applied
War Dept. 8708 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 78708 m/e 01/1945
LNER (1946) 3172 m/e 02/1947
BR 90493 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5109
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/02/1966
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1944
66B Motherwell 4w/e 16/06/1951
66B Motherwell 4w/e 14/07/1951
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 21/07/1962
36C Frodingham w/e 17/04/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 14/07/1951
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 6w/e 18/08/1962
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 01/05/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 08/05/1965
WDN   w/e 27/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Number Allocated Allocated number 63172 but not taken up    
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8708
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5109
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78708    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3172    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90493    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
14/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
27/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90493    

prev prev