Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 534 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18337 Week
» 71353 Month
» 190880 Year
» 3217733 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8709 |
m/e |
08/1944 |
War Dept. |
78709 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3173 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63173 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
British Railways |
90494 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5110 |
To Service |
During 08/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1944 |
33B |
|
Tilbury |
4w/e |
12/04/1958 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
w/e |
02/12/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
NWE |
New England |
on |
18/12/1945 |
LOAN |
33B |
Tilbury |
4w/e |
28/03/1958 |
ALLOC |
33B |
Tilbury |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
5w/e |
09/12/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8709 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5110 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78709 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3173 |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63173 |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90494 |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90494 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton |
|
|