Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1470 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19273 Week
» 72289 Month
» 191816 Year
» 3218669 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8710 |
m/e |
08/1944 |
War Dept. |
78710 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3174 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63174 |
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
British Railways |
90495 |
m/e |
07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5111 |
To Service |
During 08/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
NWE |
New England |
on |
29/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
NWE |
New England |
w/e |
04/12/1948 |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
w/e |
10/11/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8710 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5111 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78710 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3174 |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63174 |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90495 |
|
|
10/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90495 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |
|
|