|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. | SLS/194704 |
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
31/07/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines due into Works, July 1950: 61754/71, 1931, 61983, 62208, 62424, 4549/61, 67605/67, 68324, 8450, 69187, 69219, 77230, 90262, 90498. | SLS/195010 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 8713 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5114 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 78713 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3177 | ||
17/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63177 | ||
06/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90498 | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
19/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
19/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
22/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
16/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
15/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
20/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
22/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
25/09/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
27/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90498 | ||
08/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath |