Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 109 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2970 Week
» 20306 Month
» 298102 Year
» 1182483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78715 m/e 09/1944
BR 90657 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5116
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal Fri 07/09/1962
Scrapping During 10/1962 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 18 yrs , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
40B Immingham 4w/e 19/10/1957
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 09/11/1957
   Withdrawn 07/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough 22/10/1947
ALLOC 35A New England w/e 20/08/1950
ALLOC 35A New England 12/07/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   07/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78715
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5116
   
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90657    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90657    
10/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    

prev prev