Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 346 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1271 Week
» 18607 Month
» 296403 Year
» 1180784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78717 m/e 09/1944
BR 90658 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5118
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/11/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at W George, Station Steel (Wath)
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24F Fleetwood w/e 15/09/1962
10F Rose Grove w/e 14/12/1963
41D Canklow w/e 12/09/1964
41J Langwith Junction w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN LA Laira m/e 31/05/1947
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall 06/10/1949
ALLOC 27F Brunswick 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 41D Canklow 2w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 14/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78717
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5118
   
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90658    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
14/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90658    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath    

prev prev