Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 95 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3550 Week
» 14843 Month
» 279476 Year
» 1501041 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78718 m/e 09/1944
LNER (1946) 3179 m/e 02/1947
BR (1st BR) 63179 w/e 03/04/1948
BR 90500 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2300
Works Number 5119
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal Mon 12/08/1963
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 18 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1944
50A York (North) 4w/e 20/06/1953
51B Newport (Teeside) 3w/e 16/06/1956
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
52H Tyne Dock w/e 16/03/1963
   Withdrawn on 12/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 28/11/1945
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 51B Newport (Teeside) 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 31/03/1963
WDN   on 12/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78718
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5119
   
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3179    
03/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63179    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90500    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
12/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90500    

prev prev