31/12/1946 |
General |
The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. |
SLS/194704 |
27/08/1949 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. |
SLS/194910 |
01/02/1960 |
Peterborough Midland Closure |
Peterborough Midland (31F) closed as from 1st February and the engines were transferred as follows-to March D2239, 11156/7, 41949, 44152/273, 44509/21, 47300, 61095/6, 61156/204/5/323/48, 62613, 64789, 64901, 90063/447/501/28. To New England (34E) 43127; Grimesthorpe (41B) 44097/518; remainder returned to LMR viz. 43957, 44110/239/47/476/519/22. |
SLS/196003 |
13/05/1961 |
Great Eastern lines |
WDs 90501/22, which were transferred for a short time to Cambridge, have since been allocated to Tilbury (33B) but are actually working from the Ripple 1Ane (Barking) diesel depot; this normally has an allocation of 12 diesels, 6 350 h.p. shunters and 6 Brush diesels from Stratford. With the exception of D6700 all of the 1760 h.p. E.E. diesels allocated to this section (D6701-14 ) were withdrawn from service on 7th April for fitting of a new front bogies. |
SLS/196106 |
10/12/1965 |
Doncaster MPD |
Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. |
SLS/196601 |