Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 400 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6376 Week
» 12510 Month
» 240394 Year
» 1461959 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR (1st BR) 63180   Not applied
War Dept. 79177 m/e 09/1944
LNER (1946) 3180 m/e 02/1947
BR 90501 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5120
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/11/1965
Scrapping During 01/1966 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1944
31B March w/e 06/02/1960
30A Stratford w/e 03/12/1960
31A Cambridge w/e 25/03/1961
33B Tilbury w/e 22/04/1961
31B March w/e 17/06/1961
36A Doncaster w/e 28/10/1961
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 09/03/1963
36C Frodingham w/e 19/06/1965
36A Doncaster w/e 06/11/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 07/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 13/08/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 5w/e 08/04/1961
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 5w/e 13/05/1961
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 5w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   w/e 07/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704
01/02/1960 Peterborough Midland Closure Peterborough Midland (31F) closed as from 1st February and the engines were transferred as follows-to March D2239, 11156/7, 41949, 44152/273, 44509/21, 47300, 61095/6, 61156/204/5/323/48, 62613, 64789, 64901, 90063/447/501/28. To New England (34E) 43127; Grimesthorpe (41B) 44097/518; remainder returned to LMR viz. 43957, 44110/239/47/476/519/22. SLS/196003
13/05/1961 Great Eastern lines WDs 90501/22, which were transferred for a short time to Cambridge, have since been allocated to Tilbury (33B) but are actually working from the Ripple 1Ane (Barking) diesel depot; this normally has an allocation of 12 diesels, 6 350 h.p. shunters and 6 Brush diesels from Stratford. With the exception of D6700 all of the 1760 h.p. E.E. diesels allocated to this section (D6701-14 ) were withdrawn from service on 7th April for fitting of a new front bogies. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Number Allocated Allocated number 63180 but not taken up    
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 79177
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5120
   
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3180    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90501    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
28/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
07/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90501    

prev prev