Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 110 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 1347 Week
» 3929 Month
» 268562 Year
» 1490127 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79178 m/e 09/1944
BR 90659 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2307
Works Number 5121
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal Sat 18/05/1963
Scrapping During 07/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 18 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1944
38A Colwick 5w/e 17/12/1955
35A New England 5w/e 21/01/1956
   Withdrawn 18/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough 27/10/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 21/01/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 28/01/1956
WDN   18/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 79178
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5121
   
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90659    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
18/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90659    

prev prev