|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 | SLS/194704 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) | Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 79185 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5128 |
||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3182 | ||
17/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63182 | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
18/11/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90503 | ||
20/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
21/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
14/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
06/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
06/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
01/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C) | ||
14/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Royston (55D) | ||
08/10/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (55E) | ||
21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90503 | ||
04/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |