Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1834 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19637 Week
» 72653 Month
» 192180 Year
» 3219033 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79202 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
British Railways |
90670 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2307 |
Works Number |
5145 |
To Service |
During 10/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 24/06/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79202 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5145 |
|
|
22/07/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90670 |
|
|
20/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90670 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|