Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17859 Week
» 70875 Month
» 190402 Year
» 3217255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79203 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
British Railways |
90671 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2307 |
Works Number |
5146 |
To Service |
During 10/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/09/1963 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/02/1948 |
Brighton Works |
No. 21C149 is in shops for conversion to 'B.B.' Class. Nos. S79203 and S1178 are painted in black livery; the latter has the number on the bunker, still, in spite of its diminutive size. The oil-burner S21C136 left shops on 20/2. 'Schools' S938 has now left, but 903 an 906 are in shops under repair. Metal sheeting is now being added to the lower half of the boiler of the 'West Country' class in addition to the air-smoothed casing. This is believed to be an attempt to avoid the oil-bath catching fire and damaging the asbestos clothing, etc |
SLS/194804 |
28/02/1951 |
Southern Region WD\'s |
There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. |
SLS/195104 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79203 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5146 |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90671 |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E) |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90671 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|