Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1087 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 8094 Week
» 14228 Month
» 242112 Year
» 1463677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79206 m/e 11/1944
BR 90674 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5149
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 01/08/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1944
53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 19/05/1951
6B Mold Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952
38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
36A Doncaster 4w/e 13/11/1954
38A Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
36A Doncaster 5w/e 24/03/1956
40B Immingham 4w/e 16/02/1957
40E Colwick w/e 22/10/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 01/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 14/07/1947
ALLOC HTN Heaton 05/10/1947
ALLOC TWD Tweedmouth w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 05/05/1951
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 16/02/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 12/07/1953
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 01/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906
31/05/1949 Darlington Works New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 79206    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90674    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
13/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
01/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90674    

prev