Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1774 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15180 Week
» 68196 Month
» 187723 Year
» 3214576 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79213 |
m/e |
11/1944 |
British Railways |
90679 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2307 |
Works Number |
5156 |
To Service |
During 11/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/09/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
LOAN |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
LOAN |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
EXLOAN |
25A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
ALLOC |
56D |
Mirfield |
4w/e |
26/02/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/09/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79213 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5156 |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90679 |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) |
|
|
04/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90679 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|