Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 772 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4632 Week
» 7214 Month
» 271847 Year
» 1493412 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79224 m/e 11/1944
BR 90685 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2308
Works Number 5167
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 22/11/1964
Scrapping During 03/1965 at W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
Service Life 20 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1944
84K Chester West 4w/e 31/12/1950
84D Leamington 4w/e 28/02/1951
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 6w/e 30/06/1951
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 21/03/1953
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 04/10/1958
85E Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 28/11/1959
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 18/06/1960
81C Southall 4w/e 05/11/1960
36A Doncaster 02/12/1962
41D Canklow w/e 26/01/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 22/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN OXY Oxley m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC TYS Tyseley m/e 31/07/1947
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 84D Leamington m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 85E Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 02/12/1962
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41D Canklow 3w/e 02/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Vickers Armstrong Works Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). SLS/194904
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
04/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. SLS/196107
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 79224    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90685    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85E)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
22/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90685    

prev