Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 154 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14197 Week
» 79151 Month
» 281815 Year
» 3308668 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79228 |
m/e |
12/1944 |
British Railways |
90689 |
m/e |
05/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2308 |
Works Number |
5171 |
To Service |
During 12/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/02/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/01/1966 |
Colwick MPD |
Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. |
SLS/196603 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79228 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5171 |
|
|
05/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90689 |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
03/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90689 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|