Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1322 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20233 Week
» 85187 Month
» 287851 Year
» 3314704 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79236 |
m/e |
12/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3189 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63189 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90510 |
w/e |
18/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2308 |
Works Number |
5179 |
To Service |
During 12/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 04/07/1965 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1944 |
MAR |
|
March |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
40B |
|
Immingham |
4w/e |
24/10/1953 |
40E |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
22/10/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
04/07/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
NWE |
New England |
on |
29/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
4w/e |
29/10/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79236 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5179 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3189 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63189 but not taken up |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
18/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90510 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
04/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90510 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |
|
|