Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 858 Today
» 1176 Yesterday
» 5772 Week
» 3285 Month
» 231169 Year
» 1452734 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79241 m/e 12/1944
LNER (1946) 3191 m/e 02/1947
BR (1st BR) 63191 w/e 26/06/1948
BR 90512 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5184
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 18 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1944
36C Frodingham 4w/e 19/09/1953
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 29/06/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 05/09/1953
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 79241    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3191    
26/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63191    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90512    
19/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90512