Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1110 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18913 Week
» 71929 Month
» 191456 Year
» 3218309 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79242 |
m/e |
12/1944 |
British Railways |
90696 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2308 |
Works Number |
5185 |
To Service |
During 12/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 29/07/1963 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
STOCK |
MEX |
Mexborough |
on |
24/03/1947 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
20/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/07/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/11/1953 |
Darlington Works |
North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. |
SLS/195402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79242 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5185 |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90696 |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
29/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90696 |
|
|
08/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|